+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1.
- Senate concurred with S-5064.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5064.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays none.
- Committee amendment H-8051 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment H-8064, to committee amendment H-8051 adopted.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8064 filed.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8051 filed.
- CORRECTION: Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on calendar
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Jeneary, Steckman and Zumbach.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Breckenridge and Osmundson.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Natural Resources.
- Message from Senate.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment S-3031 filed, adopted.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 537.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Segebart, Boulton, and Cournoyer.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor