+ − Transition
SF372 is now SF562
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 84, nays 2.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1429.
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred with S-3153, as amended.
- Amendment S-3171 withdrawn.
- Amendment S-3177 to S-3153 filed, adopted.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1429 filed.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3171 to S-3153 filed.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3153.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1386 adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays none.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1386 filed.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 11:30AM House Lounge 1.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Lohse, Bohannan and Wheeler.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3082 filed, adopted.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-3085 filed, adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 10.
- Immediate message.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 562.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2021 1:30PM RM 24A.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Johnson.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor