+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 11:00AM RM 315.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Bolkcom, and Shipley.
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 601.
- Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Guth, Rozenboom, and Wahls.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Fiscal note.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kapucian, Rozenboom, and Wahls.
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor