+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/13/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Graber, Brown-Powers and Lohse.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-1335 filed.
- Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Ways and Means.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bacon and Bohannan.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3026 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 363.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 4:00PM RM 24A.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Petersen, and Whiting.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 226.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 1:30PM 217 Conference Room.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Bisignano, and Johnson.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS
Type:
Primary Sponsor