+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98 nays none.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Holt, Abdul-Samad and Jacobsen.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3254 out of order.
- Amendment S-3262 filed.
- Point of order raised on S-3262, ruled out of order.
- Amendment S-3260 adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0.
- Explanation of vote.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-3254 and S-3260 filed.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Chapman, Jochum, and Segebart.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor