+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- HF 305 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- Substituted for SF 322.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 322.
- Message from House.
- Attached to companion HF 305.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, yeas 99 nays none.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis and Sinclair.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 2:00PM House Lounge.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Brink, Gassman and Judge.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor