+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 895.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 786.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 837.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 835.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Seng, Behn, and Black. S.J. 673.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 641.
- Message from House. S.J. 641.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 601.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 584.
- Passed House, ayes 91, nays 3. H.J. 579.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 548.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor