+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Hagenow, Landon, and Prichard. H.J. 272.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 152.