+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 929.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
- Message from House. S.J. 863.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 816.
- Passed House, ayes 88, nays 4. H.J. 815.
- House receded. H.J. 815.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 808.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 855.
- Senate refused to concur with S-5179. S.J. 853.
- Message from House, with amendment S-5179. S.J. 853.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 818.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8306 filed. H.J. 797.
- Amendment H-8306 adopted. H.J. 798.
- Passed House, ayes 90, nays 4. H.J. 798.
- Immediate message. H.J. 799.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 766.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Forristall, Isenhart, and Landon. H.J. 721.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways & Means. H.J. 694.
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 607.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 607.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 663.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 662.
- Fiscal note. SCS.
- Amendment S-5104 filed, adopted. S.J. 662.
- Amendment S-5102 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 662.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 585.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 584.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor