+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 8:30AM RM G17.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 539.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Kraayenbrink, and Quirmbach.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor