+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2289 substituted.
- Amendment H-8260 adopted.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 2378.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8260 filed.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 11:30AM House Lounge
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 11:45AM House Lounge (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 11:45AM House Lounge
- Subcommittee: Bacon, Watts and Steckman.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2018 11:40AM RM 315
- Subcommittee: Schneider, Brown, and Bisignano.