+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 674.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 618.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 542.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 537.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 478.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Drake, Grassley, and Hunter. H.J. 379.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 342.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 335.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 387.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 385.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 261.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 253.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor