+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 806.
- Passed House, ayes 68, nays 27. H.J. 806.
- Committee amendment H-8307 as amended, adopted. H.J. 805.
- Amendment H-8308 adopted. H.J. 805.
- Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 804.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5187. S.J. 864.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8308 to H-8307 filed. H.J. 801.
- Committee amendment H-8307 filed. H.J. 801.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 801.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 536.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Point of order raised on S-5076, ruled out of order. S.J. 593.
- Amendment S-5076 filed. S.J. 593.
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 19. S.J. 593.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 508.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 594.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5073 filed, adopted. S.J. 574.
- Amendment S-5060 adopted. S.J. 574.
- Amendment S-5074 filed, lost. S.J. 573.
- Amendment S-5075 filed. S.J. 574.
- Point of order raised on S-5075, ruled out of order. S.J. 574.
- Deferred. S.J. 575.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 550.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5060 filed. S.J. 542.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 542.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Ernst. S.J. 432.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 398.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 352.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 347.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor