+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5107 filed.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Amendment H-8170 adopted.
- Amendment H-8178 to H-8170 withdrawn.
- Substituted for HF 2564.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5107.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amendments H-8170 and H-8178 filed.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed on file.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5082 filed, adopted.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2321.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 12:00PM RM 315.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Shipley.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.