+ − Transition
SF314 is now HF529
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Substituted for HF 529.
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays none.
- Immediate message.
- SF 314 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 314.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 8:00AM 217 Conference Room.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Whiting.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 1:00PM House Lounge.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nordman, Hunter and Jacobsen.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor