+ − Transition
SSB3135 is now SF2290
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5112.
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0.
- Amendment H-8311 filed, adopted.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Appropriations calendar.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2022 7:30AM House Lounge.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thompson, Mommsen and Thede.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations.
- Message from Senate.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5047 filed, adopted.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thompson, Mommsen and Prichard.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2433.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2290.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 12:30PM House Lounge 2.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 2:30PM Room G17.
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Mathis, and Sweeney.
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Ingels, Latham and Olson.
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.