+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
- Sent to Secretary of State.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee, T. Moore, Cohoon, and Fry.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee, T. Moore, Cohoon, and Fry.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 9:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Education: Schoenjahn Chair, Sinclair, Quirmbach
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recorded