+ − Transition
SSB3122 is now HSB690
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2345 substituted.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0.
- Substituted for HF 2539.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Message from Senate.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2539.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2345.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 12:30PM RM 304.1.
- Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bradley and Sunde.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Green, and Trone Garriott.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.