+ − Transition
SSB3073 is now HF2201
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2201 substituted.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2242.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2201.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2242.
- Message from House.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1.
- Immediate message.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2242.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2201.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 11:00AM Senate Lounge.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Bolkcom, and Rowley.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 11:30AM RM 304.1.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bergan, Andrews and Forbes.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.