+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Kurth and Sheets.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Local Government.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2018 11:30AM RM 315
- Subcommittee: Lofgren, Kraayenbrink, and Hogg.