+ − Transition
SSB3058 is now HF2155
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2155 substituted.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2194.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2155.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2194.
- Message from House.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2194.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2155.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 1:15PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 12:30PM House Lounge (Cancelled).
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 3:45PM Room G17.
- Subcommittee: Williams, Johnson, and Petersen.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nordman, Hansen and Westrich.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.