+ − Transition
SSB3046 is now SF2129
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 77, nays 12.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8379, yeas 52, nays 36.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted for SF 2129.
- Amendment S-5164 filed, adopted.
- HF 2165 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5166 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-8379 filed.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 2165.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8048 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8052 withdrawn.
- Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0.
- Amendment H-8099 adopted.
- Immediate message.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 2129.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8099 filed.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Amendments H-8048 and H-8052 filed.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2165.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 8:00AM House Lounge.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 2:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Giddens, and Sweeney.
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Salmon, Steckman and Stone.
- Introduced, referred to Education.