+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 58 nays 38.
- Substituted for HF 2412.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Edler, and Boulton.