+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Wills, T. Taylor, and Watts.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
- Amendment S-5018 adopted.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5018 filed.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 10:45AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- State Government: Dvorsky Chair, Schultz, Schoenjahn
- Recorded