+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 78, nays 22.
- Substituted for HF 2338.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2275 substituted.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 12.
- Fiscal note.
- Immediate message.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2275.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 4:00PM RM G17.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Paustian, Gustafson and Konfrst.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Chapman, Taylor, R., and Whiting.