+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-5087.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5087.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2097 substituted.
- Amendment H-8086 out of order.
- Amendment H-8135 adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays none.
- Amendment H-8136 adopted.
- Substituted for HF 2506.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed on file.
- Amendment H-8135 filed.
- Amendment H-8136 filed.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8086 filed.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Fiscal note.
- Immediate message.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
- Reported out of committee as SF 2097.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 3:00PM House Lounge.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Lohse, Klein and Olson.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 3:00PM RM 315.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, R. Taylor, and Whiting.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.