+ − Transition
SSB3025 is now HSB558
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2363 substituted.
- Amendment H-8236 adopted.
- Substituted for HF 2161.
- Passed House, yeas 90, nays 3.
- Immediate message.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8236 filed.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1.
- Amendment S-5077 filed, adopted.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2363.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 12:00PM Room G15.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2161.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 8:30AM RM 19.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Klein, Gaines and Paustian.
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Reichman, Johnson, and Kinney.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.