+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2089.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2235 substituted.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2235.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2089.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
- Reported out of committee as SF 2089.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 5:00PM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thorup, Maxwell and Sunde.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 8:00AM RM G17.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Cournoyer, and Kinney.
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.