+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 929.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929.
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 929.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 766.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 792.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 763.
- Passed House, ayes 88, nays none. H.J. 762.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8231. H.J. 762.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred with S-5117, as amended. S.J. 740.
- Amendment S-5137 to S-5117 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 740.
- Amendment S-5140 to S-5117 filed, adopted. S.J. 740.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 690.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 741.
- Immediate message. S.J. 741.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8231 filed. H.J. 692.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5117. S.J. 698.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8203 to amendment H-8186 filed, adopted. H.J. 630.
- Amendment H-8180 withdrawn. H.J. 630.
- Immediate message. H.J. 638.
- Amendment H-8186 as amended, adopted. H.J. 630.
- Amendments H-8181 and H-8188 adopted. H.J. 630.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 631.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Amendments H-8180, H-8181, H-8186, and H-8188 filed. H.J. 611.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 448.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Costello, Forristall, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 352.
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 342.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 336.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 387.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 383.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 275.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 266.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded