+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 81, nays 14.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Substituted for HF 2213.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2196 substituted.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8019.
- Point of order raised on H-8019, ruled not germane.
- Amendment H-8020 lost.
- Amendment H-8018 lost.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Amendments H-8018, H-8019 and H-8020 filed.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 2:15PM House Lounge.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 10:30AM RM G17.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Lohse and McConkey.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Lykam, and Nunn.