+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 86, nays 10.
- Amendment H-8107 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8110 to amendment H-8107 filed, withdrawn.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment H-8107 filed.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Holt, Baxter, and Kressig.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Public Safety.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 3:00PM Room 206
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Sodders Chair, Kinney, Whitver
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recorded