+ − Transition
SF300 is now SF450
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 92, nays none.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Kaufmann and Wessel-Kroeschell.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 450.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Shipley.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor