+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 589.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
- Amendment S-3043 as amended, adopted.
- Amendment S-3058 filed, adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3043 filed.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor