+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Sent to Governor.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1454 to Senate amendment H-1443 lost.
- Sponsor added, Bearinger.
- Amendment H-1454 to Senate amendment H-1443 filed.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1443.
- Passed House, ayes 59, nays 37.
- Immediate message.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1443 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 34, nays 16.
- Amendment S-3363 adopted.
- Amendment S-3374 lost.
- Amendment S-3374 filed.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3363 filed.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Lofgren, Behn, and Quirmbach.
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Education.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker ruled point well taken
- Withdrawn.
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Speaker ruled point well taken
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Deferred, retained on calendar.
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Speaker ruled point not well taken.
- Passed House, ayes 61, nays 38.
- Immediate message.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Forristall, Carlin and Nielsen.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor