+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
- Sent to Governor.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 9.
- Senate concurred with S-3279.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1259 adopted.
- Committee amendment H-1213 adopted.
- Amendment H-1234 lost.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3279.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays 3.
- Immediate message.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1259 filed.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1234 filed.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-1213 filed.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Koester and Steckman.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 10.
- Amendment S-3094 lost.
- Amendment S-3088 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment S-3097 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-3092 adopted.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3088 filed.
- Amendments S-3092 and S-3094 filed.
- Deferred.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/12/2017 12:30PM RM 116
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Quirmbach.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor