+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2581 substituted.
- Amendment S-5101 adopted.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
- Amendment S-5101 filed.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 2581.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Kinney, and Sinclair.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor