+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2347.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2536 substituted.
- Amendment S-5008 adopted.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 2347.
- Message from House.
- Attached to similar HF 2536.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8030 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8030 filed.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5008 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2347.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bergan and Konfrst.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Shipley, and Taylor, R.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor