+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Best, Carlson, and Finkenauer.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23.
- Amendment S-3009 filed, adopted.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor