+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 769.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 734.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 734.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 696.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 628.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays 2. H.J. 626.
- Substituted for HF 2455. H.J. 625.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 605.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 587.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 647.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 643.
- Amendment S-5096 filed, adopted. S.J. 643.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 585.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 584.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor