+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2018 8:15AM House Lounge.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Lundgren and Ourth.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 2.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:00PM RM 24
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 10:00AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 10:00AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:00AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:00AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:00AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee: Guth, Sinclair, and Allen.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor