+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 720.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 674.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 619.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 548.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 547.
- Substituted for HF 2375. H.J. 547.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 367.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 365.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 420.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 414.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 358.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 346.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor