+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 231.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 311 substituted.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 311.
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 231.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2017 8:30AM 206
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Guth, C. Johnson, and Lykam.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2017 8:45AM House Lounge
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Pettengill, Forbes and Landon.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor