+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Wills, Cownie and Meyer.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal note, revised.
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5056 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5047 filed.
- Point of order raised.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-5052 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5053 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5054 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5055 to S-5047 filed, withdrawn.
- Amendment S-5062 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5063 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5025 out of order.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5057 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 22.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment S-5047 adopted.
- Amendment S-5059 to S-5047 filed, lost.
- Point of order raised on S-5058, ruled out of order.
- Amendment S-5058 to S-5047 filed.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5025 filed.
- Fiscal note.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
- Subcommittee: Chapman, Breitbach, and Boulton.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor