+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 674.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 618.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 542.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 540.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 494.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Maxwell, Moore, and Muhlbauer. H.J. 448.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 366.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 364.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 420.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 419.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 348.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 340.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor