+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on calendar.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Hunter and Nordman.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Local Government.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2267.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2022 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Driscoll, Guth, and Quirmbach.
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor