+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-5108.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5108.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 92, nays 4.
- Amendment H-8171 withdrawn.
- Committee amendment H-8165 adopted.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8171 filed.
- Committee amendment H-8165 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 10:30AM House Lounge.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Brown-Powers and Fry.
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5024 filed, adopted.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 12:30PM RM G17.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Celsi, and Johnson.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor