+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 226.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 418 substituted.
- Amendment S-3128 filed, adopted.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Attached to similar HF 418.
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 226.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 99, nays none.
- Amendment H-1103 adopted.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1103 filed.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Breitbach, Cournoyer and Taylor, T..
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Worthan, A. Meyer and Judge.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor