+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 633.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 467.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 489.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 446.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 437.
- Substituted for HF 2404. H.J. 437.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 350.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 349.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 409.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 408.
- Amendment S-5014 adopted. S.J. 407.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5014 filed. S.J. 394.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 298.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 295.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor