+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2623 substituted.
- Deferred.
- Fiscal note.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2623.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2411.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Giddens.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2240.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Smith, R., Bisignano, and Cournoyer.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor