+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 929.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929.
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 929.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 883.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 842.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 840.
- Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 840.
- Conference committee report filed. H.J. 839.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 836.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 880.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 879.
- Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 878.
- Conference committee report filed. S.J. 878.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 873.
- Senate insisted. S.J. 872.
- Senate conference committee appointed, Wilhelm, Ragan, Dvorsky, Johnson, and Smith. S.J. 872.
- Message from House. S.J. 875.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 824.
- House conference committee appointed Baltimore, Hess, Kaufmann, Heddens, and Wolfe. H.J. 824.
- Immediate message. H.J. 827.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 864.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 806.
- House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-8284. H.J. 804.
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8284 filed. H.J. 769.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 768.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5155 withdrawn. S.J. 801.
- Amendment S-5159 adopted. S.J. 801.
- Senate concurred with S-5092, as amended. S.J. 801.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 801.
- Immediate message. S.J. 803.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5159 filed. S.J. 796.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5155 filed. S.J. 787.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5092. S.J. 641.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 577.
- Passed House, ayes 92, nays 2. H.J. 574.
- Committee amendment H-8119 as amended, adopted. H.J. 574.
- Amendment H-8149 to committee amendment H-8119 filed, adopted. H.J. 574.
- Amendment H-8146 to committee amendment H-8119 filed, lost. H.J. 574.
- Amendment H-8143 to committee amendment H-8119 adopted. H.J. 573.
- Amendment H-8129 to committee amendment H-8119 withdrawn. H.J. 573.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8143 filed. H.J. 568.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8129 filed. H.J. 535.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8119 filed. H.J. 497.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 495.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Baltimore, Heaton, and Wolfe. H.J. 469.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 414.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 412.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 462.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 461.
- Amendment S-5036 adopted. S.J. 460.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5036 filed. S.J. 448.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 297.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 295.
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor